+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
- House/ uncircled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ to standing committee
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ circled
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
+ − Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (10)
March 10, 2016: House/ circled
March 10, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
March 10, 2016: House/ uncircled
March 8, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
March 7, 2016: Senate/ uncircled
March 7, 2016: Senate/ circled
March 7, 2016: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
March 7, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6
March 4, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 25, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor