+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 5, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor