+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ under suspension of the rules
- House/ lifted from Rules
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ lifted from Rules
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 16, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor