+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 17, 2008 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President sent for enrolling
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ amended
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ concurs with House amendments
- Senate/ to House
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ lift bill from committee
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- House/ comm report/ sent to Rules Committee
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On February 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
On February 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ substitute
- Senate/ pass 2nd
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 30, 2008 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 2008: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 6
March 4, 2008: Senate/ concurs with House amendments
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 19, 2008: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
February 18, 2008: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 5, 2008: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor