+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (9)
March 9, 2020: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 65
- Absent: 10
March 5, 2020: House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 8
March 5, 2020: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 8
March 2, 2020: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 28, 2020: Senate/ uncircled
February 28, 2020: Senate/ circled
February 28, 2020: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
February 28, 2020: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 26, 2020: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor