+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 17, 2003 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/to Governor
On March 11, 2003 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/signed by President/ enrolled
- Senate/received from House
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Senate
- House Signed by Speaker sent Senate
- House Passed 3rd Reading
- House Read 3rd Time
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 2nd Time
- House Comm Report Favorable
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 1st Time (Introduced)
- House Sent to Standing Committee
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- House Received from Senate
On January 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/to House with amendments
- Senate/pass 3rd
- Senate/read 3rd
On January 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/pass 2nd
- Senate/floor amendment
- Senate/read 2nd
On January 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/under suspension of the rules
- Senate/from Rules Comm to 2nd
- Senate/read 1st (Introduced)
On January 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/received from LRGC
On December 17, 2002 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On December 12, 2002 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 3
Prepared
+ − Votes (3)
January 30, 2003: House Passed 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 65
- Absent: 10
January 23, 2003: Senate/pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
January 22, 2003: Senate/pass 2nd
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor