+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (56)
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ substituted
- Senate/ uncircled
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 4, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Amendments (6)
House Amendment # 6
Passed
House Amendment # 5
Passed
House Amendment # 3
Prepared
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
House Amendment # 2
Prepared
+ − Votes (11)
March 7, 2012: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
March 6, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 3
March 6, 2012: House/ uncircled
March 6, 2012: House/ floor amendment
March 2, 2012: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
March 2, 2012: Senate/ circled
March 2, 2012: Senate/ floor amendment
March 2, 2012: Senate/ uncircled
March 1, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 29
March 1, 2012: Senate/ substituted
February 22, 2012: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor