+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 1
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (7)
March 5, 2021: House/ floor amendment # 1
March 5, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
March 5, 2021: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 26, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 7
February 22, 2021: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 19, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
February 17, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor