+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ filed
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
- House/ to Senate
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 4
February 29, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 23, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor