+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ to Senate
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ placed on Consent Cal
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Absent: 9
February 16, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 6
February 13, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 10, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 10
February 2, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor