+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ lifted from standing committee
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor