+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (6)
March 12, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2013: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 29
March 1, 2013: Senate/ uncircled
February 27, 2013: Senate/ circled
February 26, 2013: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 15, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor