+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 2
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
House Floor Amendment 2
Passed
Senate Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (10)
March 9, 2017: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
March 9, 2017: House/ floor amendment # 2
March 9, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
March 6, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 1
March 1, 2017: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2017: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
February 28, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 23, 2017: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
February 23, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
February 9, 2017: Senate Comm - Held
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor