+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ filed
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor