+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
March 5, 2021: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 4, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
March 4, 2021: House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
February 25, 2021: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 6
February 25, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
February 19, 2021: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 18, 2021: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
February 18, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 12, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor