+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (50)
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Votes (9)
March 10, 2016: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
March 10, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
March 10, 2016: House/ uncircled
March 9, 2016: House/ circled
March 8, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
March 2, 2016: Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
March 2, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
March 1, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 26, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor