+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment # 1
Passed
House Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Votes (6)
March 13, 2013: House/ floor amendment
March 13, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
March 13, 2013: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 26, 2013: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
February 25, 2013: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 29
February 11, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor