+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ filed
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
+ − Vote
February 26, 2016: Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor