+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 17, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendments
- Senate/ to House
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ under suspension of the rules
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ read 2nd time
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2006: Senate/ concurs with House amendments
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 10
February 17, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 14, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 13, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 3, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor