+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ 2nd suspended
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment # 2
Passed
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (7)
March 13, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 3
March 13, 2014: House/ uncircled
March 11, 2014: House/ circled
March 6, 2014: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
March 5, 2014: Senate/ floor amendment
March 5, 2014: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 25, 2014: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor