+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
+ − Votes (7)
March 9, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
March 4, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 4
March 1, 2016: Senate/ uncircled
March 1, 2016: Senate/ circled
March 1, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
February 29, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
February 23, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor