+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ placed on Consent Cal
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ substitute
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 2007: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
February 21, 2007: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 5
February 13, 2007: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 12, 2007: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
January 31, 2007: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor