+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
- House/ read 2nd time
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ substitute/ amended
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On February 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2008: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 20, 2008: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 19, 2008: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
February 11, 2008: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor