+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 17, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Senate/ received from House
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ to standing committee
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ substituted/placed on Consent
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Committee
On January 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (4)
February 17, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 58
- Absent: 17
February 13, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 5
February 3, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
January 30, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor