+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt sent to Rules Committee
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On February 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Vote
February 15, 2005: Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor