+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
- House/ to Senate
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- House/ committee return to Rules Committee
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ substitute
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ substitute
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On January 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (3)
February 14, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 13, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
January 27, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor