+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ lifted from Rules
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 19, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment # 3
Passed
Senate Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Votes (2)
March 2, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
February 18, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor