+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate/ substituted
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (4)
February 26, 2014: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 25, 2014: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 25, 2014: Senate/ substituted
February 12, 2014: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor