+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 16, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ under suspension of the rules
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ substitute
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Committee
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
February 27, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
February 17, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 16, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 8, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor