+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Senate/ received from House
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ concurs with House amendments
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ received from House
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
- House/ read 2nd time
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ floor amendment
On February 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ pass 2nd
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 2004: Senate/ concurs with House amendments
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 6
February 26, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 74
- Absent: 1
February 23, 2004: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 4
February 18, 2004: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 16, 2004: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 6, 2004: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor