+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 22, 2004 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Senate/ received from House
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ placed on Consent Cal
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (4)
February 20, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 61
- Absent: 14
February 17, 2004: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 4
February 12, 2004: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 6, 2004: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor