+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (47)
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ received from House
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On December 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (10)
March 3, 2022: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 2, 2022: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 8
February 14, 2022: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 5
February 14, 2022: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 5
February 2, 2022: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
February 1, 2022: Senate/ uncircled
February 1, 2022: Senate/ circled
February 1, 2022: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
January 24, 2022: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 6
January 24, 2022: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor