+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ failed
- House/ amended
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ lift bill from committee
- House/ to Senate
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report/ sent to Rules Committee
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ to House
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ substitute
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 2009: House/ failed
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 43
- Absent: 2
February 25, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 8
February 24, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
February 6, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor