+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ received from Senate
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ to House
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ received from House
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ circled
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment # 2
Committee Amendments Prepared
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (9)
March 6, 2014: Senate/ uncircled
March 6, 2014: Senate/ circled
March 6, 2014: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
March 5, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
March 3, 2014: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
February 25, 2014: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 24, 2014: Senate/ floor amendment
February 24, 2014: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 6, 2014: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor