+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 16, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 13
February 13, 2017: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 7, 2017: Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 7, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 7, 2017: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor