+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- House/ return to Rules Comm due to fiscal impact
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ substitute/ amended
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 5, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 29, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (5)
March 5, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 13, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
February 3, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 2, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
January 27, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor