+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 26, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ lifted from Rules
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ lifted from Rules
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 14, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 10, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 19, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 2
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (3)
March 11, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
March 2, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 19, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor