+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (51)
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ failed
- House/ to Senate
- House/ motion to reconsider
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
March 10, 2016: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
March 10, 2016: House/ failed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 41
- Absent: 2
March 10, 2016: House/ motion to reconsider
March 10, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 6
March 1, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 4
February 29, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 3
February 17, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 16, 2016: Senate Comm - Held
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor