+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Sen. Adams, J. S.
Type:
Primary Sponsor