+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate Comm - Held
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
March 8, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 4
March 7, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 4
March 1, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
February 29, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 24, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor