+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- House/ return to Rules Comm due to fiscal impact
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ substituted
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
February 15, 2007: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 4
February 6, 2007: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 29
February 5, 2007: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 29
January 23, 2007: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor