+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 23, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- House/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ placed back on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ motion to reconsider passed
- Senate/ motion to reconsider
- Senate/ failed
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed back on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 64
- Absent: 11
February 25, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 5
February 18, 2010: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 17, 2010: Senate/ failed
- Nays: 27
- Absent: 2
February 17, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 9, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor