+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt sent to Rules Committee
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On January 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On January 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 22, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 18, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor