+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 14, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 19, 2011 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 13, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 17, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Votes (4)
February 1, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 74
- Absent: 1
January 30, 2012: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 13
- Absent: 1
January 25, 2012: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
January 24, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor