+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ motion to reconsider
- House/ motion to reconsider/ passed
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ substituted
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate/ to House
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ concurs with House amendments
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ lift bill from committee
- House/ under suspension of the rules
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ circled
- House/ uncircled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- House/ return to Rules Comm due to fiscal impact
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd (Suspension
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On December 19, 2008 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 18, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
March 12, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 5
March 12, 2009: Senate/ concurs with House amendments
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
March 4, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 15
- Absent: 1
February 26, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 29
February 24, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd (Suspension
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 9, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor