+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- House/ lifted from Rules
On February 4, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ circled
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Votes (11)
February 21, 2017: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 16, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 2, 2017: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 4
February 2, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 4
February 2, 2017: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 4
January 26, 2017: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
January 25, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
January 25, 2017: Senate/ substituted
January 25, 2017: Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
January 25, 2017: Senate/ uncircled
January 23, 2017: Senate/ circled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor