+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
On January 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Vote
January 25, 2007: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor