+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 3
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (11)
February 24, 2021: Senate/ uncircled
February 24, 2021: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
February 24, 2021: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 7
February 24, 2021: Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
February 23, 2021: Senate/ circled
February 23, 2021: Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
February 19, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6
February 17, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 17, 2021: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 7
February 17, 2021: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- Yeas: 7
February 17, 2021: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 3
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor