+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/to Governor
On March 17, 2003 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 14, 2003 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/signed by President/ enrolled
- Senate/received from House
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- House Signed by Speaker sent Senate
- House Passed 3rd Reading
- House Read 3rd Time
On March 4, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 2nd Time
- House Under Suspension of the Rules
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 2nd Time
- House Comm Report Favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Standing Committee
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 1st Time (Introduced)
- House Received from Senate
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/to House
- Senate/pass 3rd
- Senate/read 3rd
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/pass 2nd
- Senate/read 2nd
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/committee report favorable
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/to Standing Committee
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/received from LRGC
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2003: House Passed 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 75
February 18, 2003: Senate/pass 3rd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 17, 2003: Senate/pass 2nd
- Yeas: 29
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor