+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 8, 2016: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
March 8, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
March 8, 2016: House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
March 3, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 4
February 29, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 26, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 21
- Absent: 8
February 26, 2016: Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
February 10, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor